FL S0470 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "special operations forces"; authorizing a full-time, part-time, or auxiliary correctional officer to be employed at 18 years of age; exempting former special operations forces members who meet certain requirements from the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission-approved basic recruit training program; requiring an employing agency, training center, or criminal justice selection center to verify and document that special operations forces applicants meet certain requirements if the applicants seek an exemption from a basic recruit training program approved by the commission, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 333 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/18/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H333 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17296 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |