FL S0472 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain students who were adopted from the Department of Children and Families or who are or were in the custody of the department under certain circumstances from paying tuition and fees at workforce education programs, Florida College System institutions, and state universities, etc.
Title
Tuition and Fee Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Higher Education |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/472 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0472/BillText/Filed/HTML |