FL S0472 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to establish the Dyslexia Choice Academy Pilot Project; requiring the Duval County School Board to provide mentoring services to participating school districts; providing Dyslexia Choice Academy, school district, department, and legislative funding requirements, etc.
Title
Exceptional Student Education
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0377 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/472 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0472/BillText/Filed/HTML |