FL S0478 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the applicability of the rental car surcharge; imposing the surcharge on certain motor vehicle leases or rentals by a peer-to-peer car-sharing program; specifying motor vehicle insurance requirements for shared vehicles on a peer-to-peer car-sharing program; requiring a peer-to-peer car-sharing program to assume specified liability of a shared vehicle owner; requiring a shared vehicle owner's insurer to indemnify the peer-to-peer car-sharing program under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H377 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H723 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H723 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 0606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |