FL S0480 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted CS/HM 227 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 227 (Adopted) -SJ 00781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Congress of the United States to preserve the authority of the Governor to retain command and control of the Florida National Guard and to reject any changes to federal law which would restrict or diminish the authority of the Governor to activate the Florida National Guard in response to a domestic crisis, disaster, or other emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Control of Florida National Guard by Governor [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted CS/HM 227 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 227 (Adopted) -SJ 00781
2010-04-16 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00635; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2010-03-03 Now in Rules -SJ 00183
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Rules -SJ 00040; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 37-S; Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00183
2010-02-25 On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 37-S -SJ 00040
2009-12-09 Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Rules
2009-10-20 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0227 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State -HJ 01700

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback