FL S0480 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying laws and rules to be enforced by the Department of Health; revising applicability of recreational vehicle park requirements to mobile home parks; providing for an annual operating permit fee to be charged to operators of certain parks or camps; providing that an operator of a mobile home park, lodging park, recreational vehicle park, or recreational camp who refuses to pay the operating permit fee required by law or who fails, neglects, or refuses to obtain an operating permit for the park commits a misdemeanor of the second degree; providing requirements for the establishment of separation and setback distances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Home and Recreational Vehicle Parks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
2012-02-03 Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
2012-02-03 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 328
2012-02-01 Now in Budget -SJ 301
2012-01-31 CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 304
2012-01-31 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2012-01-30 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 301
2012-01-25 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2012-01-12 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 135
2012-01-12 Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 135
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 43
2012-01-03 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-11-03 Now in Health Regulation
2011-11-03 Original reference(s)- removed: Transportation
2011-11-02 Referred to Transportation; Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Budget
2011-10-06 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51313Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback