FL S0480 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Polk County, the City of Auburndale, the City of Bartow, the City of Eagle Lake, the City of Fort Meade, the City of Frostproof, the City of Lake Wales, the City of Mulberry, and the City of Polk City to apply, individually or jointly, to the Department of Economic Opportunity for designation of a specified number of enterprise zones, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2013-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0221 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback