FL S0480 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Commission on Federalism; requiring the commission to determine if an evaluated federal law violates the principle of federalism, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Federalism

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Judiciary
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2013-12-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
2013-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0835 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback