FL S0480 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Student Online Personal Information Protection Act"; prohibiting an operator from displaying targeted advertising, using certain information to amass student profiles for certain purposes, or selling or disclosing covered information; specifying certain actions by operators, law enforcement agencies, service providers, and students which are not prohibited by the act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Data Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Education Pre-K - 12
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-01-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0059 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002223Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback