FL S0480 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-08HouseIn Messages
2017-03-08SenateImmediately certified
2017-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2017-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/17
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-02-21SenateFavorable by- Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2017-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0225 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H73 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback