FL S0480 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the public health crisis created by pornography, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health Crisis Created by Pornography

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H157 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - CS adopted

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback