FL S0484 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "first responder" for purposes of eligibility for the tax exemption to include a law enforcement officer or firefighter who, before becoming a resident of this state, sustained a total and permanent disability in the line of duty while serving as a full-time paid law enforcement officer or firefighter in another state; defining the term "law enforcement officer," etc.
Title
First Responder Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H281 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/484 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/484/BillText/Filed/HTML |