FL S0488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a pharmacist or practitioner from dispensing specified opioids unless the prescription bottle or container has a warning sticker meeting certain requirements; requiring pharmacies to offer for sale prescription lock boxes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H287 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback