FL S0494 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing, at specified timeframes, the percentage of cigarette tax proceeds paid to the Board of Directors of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute for certain purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H411 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback