FL S0496 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the rights of children and young adults in out-of-home care; requiring the Florida Children's Ombudsman to serve as an autonomous entity within the department for certain purposes; requiring that a case plan be developed in a face-to-face conference with a caregiver of a child under certain circumstances; requiring a caseworker to provide specified information relating to subsidies that early learning coalitions provide to caregivers of certain children, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-11-12SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-10-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1045 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback