FL S0508 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the requirements for the Department of Education's annual report on apprenticeship and preapprenticeship programs; revising and providing additional duties for the department relating to apprenticeship programs; specifying that apprenticeship program sponsors who meet certain conditions are eligible to receive direct reimbursements from the department for apprenticeship programs; expanding the rights of parents of public school students to include rights relating to workforce education opportunities, etc.
Title
Apprenticeship and Preapprenticeship Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H175 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/508 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/508/BillText/Filed/HTML |