FL S0512 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a nonembryonic stem cell bank from performing certain processes on adult human nonembryonic stem cells or HCT/Ps under certain circumstances; providing that a nonembryonic stem cell bank that performs certain functions is deemed a clinic; requiring such nonembryonic stem cell banks to comply with specified requirements, etc.
Title
Nonembryonic Stem Cell Banks
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (114166) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (492054) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H313 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
S7066 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S7066 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 06017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |