FL S0520 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the authorized uses of drones by law enforcement agencies and other specified entities for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Drones
Sponsors
Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1433 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar