FL S0530 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the arrest, charge, prosecution, or penalization under specified provisions of a person acting in good faith who seeks medical assistance for an individual experiencing, or believed to be experiencing, an alcohol-related overdose; prohibiting the arrest, charge, prosecution, or penalization under specified provisions of a person acting in good faith who seeks medical assistance for an individual experiencing, or believed to be experiencing, a drug-related overdose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol or Drug Overdose Prosecutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 595
2019-04-24SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 595
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-10SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-19SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H595 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Ordered enrolled
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
562112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback