FL S0534 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Education to maintain a disqualification list that includes the identities of certain persons; requiring district school boards to investigate certain complaints and report certain results of such investigations to the department; prohibiting an individual who is on the disqualification list from being employed by a charter school or serving as a member of a charter school governing board; requiring certain private schools to adopt policies establishing standards of ethical conduct for certain employees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-09SenateCS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations; Rules
2019-10-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H883 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012796Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012797Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback