FL S0542 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing exemptions from the sales and use tax on the retail sale of certain clothing, wallets, bags, school supplies, personal computers, and personal computer-related accessories during a specified timeframe; specifying locations where the exemptions do not apply; authorizing certain dealers to opt out of participating in the tax holiday, subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
Back-to-school Sales Tax Holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10