FL S0544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the applicability of procedures for the resolution of protests arising from the contract solicitation or award process for certain procurements by specified transportation, expressway, and bridge authorities, etc.
Title
Procurement Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/544 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/544/BillText/Filed/HTML |