FL S0546 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from licensure under specified provisions for certain persons authorized by the Office of Financial Regulation to cash certain payment instruments within a specified aggregate face value range; requiring the office to authorize the person to cash such instruments without such licensure if certain conditions are met, etc.
Title
Licensure of Check Cashers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/546 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/546/BillText/Filed/HTML |