FL S0562 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a homestead assessment limitation for the purpose of school district levies to certain persons age 65 years or older; authorizing persons entitled to and receiving a certain homestead exemption to apply for and receive the limitation; requiring a property appraiser who makes a certain determination to serve upon the owner a notice of intent to record a tax lien against the property, etc.
Title
Homestead Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S344 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
H317 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H1205 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H317 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H1205 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |