FL S0568 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to recognize the month of May as "Haitian Heritage Month", etc.
Title
Haitian Heritage Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0069 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H0333 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0600 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H9057 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted by Publication
H0333 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0600 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H9057 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/568 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0568/BillText/Filed/HTML |