FL S0572 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain health insurance policies to provide hearing aid coverage for insured children, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage for Hearing Aids for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-19SenateNow in Health Policy
2019-03-18SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-01-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H531 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276413Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback