FL S0574 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the powers and duties of the district school board to authorize the adoption of rules regarding procurement practices; authorizing a district school board's use of electronic auction services in conjunction with bid pooling for school buses and related purchases, etc.
Title
Electronic Auction Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Messages |
2015-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0615 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
S1264 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1264 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
283 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |