FL S0574 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the conditional aging inmate release program within the Department of Corrections; requiring that an inmate who meets certain criteria be considered for conditional aging inmate release; providing victim notification requirements under certain circumstances; providing that an inmate who is approved for conditional aging inmate release must be released from the department's custody within a reasonable amount of time; prohibiting an aging releasee or his or her community-based housing from being counted in the prison system population and the prison capacity figures, respectively, etc.
Title
Conditional Aging Inmate Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/22/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H837 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1718 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1718 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |