FL S0578 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising membership of the Board of Professional Geologists; revising geologist-in-training registration requirements; revising the types of documents that require the signature, date, and seal of a professional geologist; providing that certain persons may only maintain their specified exemptions if they do not submit documents for public record, etc.
Title
Professional Geology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H279 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
492 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/578 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/578/BillText/Filed/HTML |