FL S0584 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements relating to the Council on Physician Assistants membership, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council on Physician Assistants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-19SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-18SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-10-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H471 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H713 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback