FL S0600 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the DOC and the Parole Commission to establish agreements to implement a federal deportation program for state inmates. Requires the Control Release Authority to implement a program to execute an immediate deportation order. Creates provisions relating to control release for removal and deportation to require the DOC to identify eligible inmates at the reception process, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inmates/Illegal or Undocumented Aliens/Deportation [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Judiciary
2010-03-19 Now in Judiciary -SJ 00278
2010-03-18 Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00278
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00046
2009-12-17 Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
2009-11-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0919 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0947146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
09471461New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback