FL S0600 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amends a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for identification and location information of certain current and former employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice and their family members. Revises the job classifications specified in the exemption to reflect those classifications used by the department. Removes the scheduled repeal of the exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Records/DJJ Employees & Family Members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-29 Read 2nd time -SJ 594
2011-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11
2011-04-07 Original reference(s)- removed: Rules -SJ 461
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/11, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2011-03-28 Now in Rules -SJ 286
2011-03-24 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-23 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -SJ 286
2011-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/23/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-10 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 185
2011-03-09 Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 185
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 51
2011-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-02-09 Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 51
2011-01-26 SPB 7012 submitted as a committee bill (SB 600) by Criminal Justice

Same As/Similar To

H7075 () 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1163

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback