FL S0600 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a legislative finding; providing for certain documents to be electronically signed and sealed by the licensee and electronically transmitted to a building code administrator or building official for approval, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Filing of Construction Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch.
2012-02-24 Received -HJ 830
2012-02-24 Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee; Education Committee; Redistricting Committee; Appropriations Committee; Finance and Tax Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee -HJ 830
2012-02-23 In Messages
2012-02-14 CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 512
2012-02-14 Read 3rd time -SJ 512
2012-02-13 Placed on 3rd reading
2012-02-13 Read 2nd time -SJ 492
2012-02-09 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/12
2012-01-31 CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time -SJ 304
2012-01-31 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 301
2012-01-30 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2012-01-26 CS/CS by- Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 301
2012-01-23 On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2012-01-10 CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 105
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 51
2011-12-09 Now in Regulated Industries -SJ 112
2011-12-07 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-12-05 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 112
2011-11-22 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/11, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2011-11-02 Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries -SJ 51
2011-10-19 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
468604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
713135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback