FL S0600 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising qualifications for late voter registration; prohibiting an individual from providing assistance to more than 10 electors during any election; providing a limitation on the number of words for certain ballot summaries in joint resolutions proposed by the Legislature; authorizing the supervisor to designate one additional early voting site per election; requiring the supervisor to allow electors to complete an affidavit to cure an unsigned absentee ballot prior to canvassing, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-16SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
2013-04-16SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7013
2013-04-16SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/16/13
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-10SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2013-04-10SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-09SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2013-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/13, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2013-04-04SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2013-04-04SenateNow in Rules
2013-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-02SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2013-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2013-03-25SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2013-03-20SenateNow in Community Affairs
2013-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-03-18SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 5
2013-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/04/13, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed
2013-02-07SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2013-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0385 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0397 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H1045 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H7013 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-57
H7021 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0082 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0668 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S1198 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10156065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1040616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/600
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/BillText/c3/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/318644/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/405294/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/474422/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/391950/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/572946/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/822722/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/623094/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/244238/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/448424/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/934498/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/347328/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/467264/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/430418/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/650138/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/626474/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/474458/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/866118/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/399758/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/938842/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/155566/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/929070/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/528194/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/180402/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/730616/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/943324/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/386482/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/797954/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/422386/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/119654/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/314626/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/891828/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/580004/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0600/Amendment/594590/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback