FL S0600 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a final order in specified administrative proceedings award all reasonable costs and attorney fees to a prevailing party under certain circumstances; revising the criteria used by an administrative law judge to determine if a party participated in a proceeding for an improper purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-01-16SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2014-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0975 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S1626 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
H1355 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
120595Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback