FL S0600 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 189 (Ch. 2015-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "asset" to include Florida Insurance Guaranty Association assessments, under certain conditions, for purposes of determining the financial condition of an insurer; transferring a provision relating to the obligation of the Florida Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association to pay valid claims under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Guaranty Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 189 (Ch. 2015-167)
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted CS/HB 189
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-02SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-18SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-17SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2015-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-16SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/16/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2015-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-17SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0189 (Similar To) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-167

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
624316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627828Amended CodeSee Bill Text
629401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631737Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback