FL S0600 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising legislative intent relating to the Rural Economic Development Initiative; revising the duties, responsibilities, and membership of the Rural Economic Development Initiative; deleting a provision listing the economic development incentives for which the Governor may waive criteria requirements or similar provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Economic Development Initiative

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Rules
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-04-18SenateNow in Rules
2017-04-17SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-04-06SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-04-04SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2017-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-03SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-03-14SenateNow in Agriculture
2017-03-13SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0333 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H7005 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
257193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28806561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29006561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33963Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276699Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback