FL S0600 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising private school eligibility requirements for the state school choice scholarship program, etc.
Title
Private School Eligibility Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H655 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/600 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/600/BillText/Filed/HTML |