FL S0604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "court" and "criminal county court" for purposes of involuntary outpatient placement; expanding eligibility for military veterans and servicemembers court programs; creating the Forensic Hospital Diversion Pilot Program; providing for courts to order certain defendants on probation or community control to postadjudicatory mental health court programs, etc.
Title
Mental Health Services in the Criminal Justice System
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Miguel Diaz De La Portilla [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 439 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-11-17 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/17/15, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0439 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-127, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 47891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 47892 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 658 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
910 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |