FL S0606 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that an independent sanctioning authority for youth athletic teams and the Florida High School Athletic Association adopt guidelines, bylaws, and policies relating to the nature and risk of exertional heat stroke and heat-related injury in youth athletes; requiring that a parent or guardian of a youth who participates in an athletic competition or who is a candidate for an athletic team sign and return an informed-consent form before the youth athlete participates in an athletic competition or engages in any practice, tryout, workout, or other physical activity; requiring that any youth athlete who is suspected of suffering from an exertional heat stroke or heat-related injury during a practice or competition be removed from the practice or competition, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth Athletes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Education Pre-K - 12
2012-01-26 Now in Education Pre-K - 12 -SJ 279
2012-01-25 Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 279
2012-01-20 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 52
2011-11-02 Referred to Health Regulation; Education Pre-K - 12 -SJ 52
2011-10-19 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430438Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback