FL S0610 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1101 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1101 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the kinds of insurance for which a captive insurer may seek licensure; limiting the risks that certain captive insurers may insure; specifying requirements and conditions relating to a captive insurer's authority to conduct business; specifying certain fees to be paid by captive insurance companies; requiring biographical affidavits, background investigations, and fingerprint cards for all officers and directors; providing restrictions on officers and directors involved with insolvent insurers under certain conditions; providing restrictions on officers and directors that are found guilty of, or have pleaded guilty or nolo contendere to, any felony or crime involving moral turpitude, including a crime of dishonesty or breach of trust, etc.
Title
Captive Insurance
Sponsors
Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Senate Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | Sen. Miguel Diaz De La Portilla [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1101 (Ch. | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-01-17 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 249 | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Budget -SJ 214 | |
2012-01-12 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 214 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time -SJ 105 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 52 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 01/12/12, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-12-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2011-12-13 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 109 | |
2011-12-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-12-07 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-22 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/07/11, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 52 | |
2011-10-20 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
626 | 7491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 914 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 9141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 9142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 919 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 920 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |