FL S0612 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that the monthly leasing fee for an ignition interlock device be discounted by specified percentages under certain circumstances when a person claims inability to pay; authorizing a court, upon agreement by a state attorney, to withhold adjudication of guilt for certain criminal violations relating to driving under the influence, under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving Under the Influence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H929 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161937Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316656Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback