FL S0618 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the tax imposed on rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property; providing for the future repeal of specified provisions relating to the imposition of a tax on the rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property, etc.
Title
Tax on Commercial Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/618 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/618/BillText/Filed/HTML |