FL S0618 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the holding of a child awaiting trial who is treated as an adult for purposes of criminal prosecution in a jail or other facility intended or used for the detention of adults; providing an exception; providing a requirement and a prohibition if a court determines that it is in the interest of justice to allow a child to be held in a jail or other facility intended or used for the detention of adults, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Detention of Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-10-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H421 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H285 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S610 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback