FL S0620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying additional military installations that may exchange certain information with local governments regarding compatibility of land development; providing that an easement for certain military lands continues after a tax sale or deed execution; directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Blue Angels license plate; requiring a student whose parent is transferred or pending transfer to a military installation within a school district to be considered a resident of the district and provided preferential treatment in the controlled open enrollment process under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Military-friendly Initiatives
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs and Space Committee | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#324 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chapter No. 2019-144 | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (507250) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-04 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H891 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1686 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1686 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 682 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |