FL S0628 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Reclassifying a criminal offense relating to the donation of blood, plasma, organs, skin, or other human tissue; expanding the scope of unlawful acts by a person infected with a sexually transmissible disease; expanding the list of sexually transmittable diseases; requiring that a person who commits, rather than one who attempts to commit, an offense involving the transmission of semen or vaginal secretions must undergo HIV testing, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transmission of Disease Through Bodily Fluids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Health Policy
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-28SenateNow in Health Policy
2017-03-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2017-03-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-21SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2017-02-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0605 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H0165 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S1704 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback