FL S0632 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring specified teachers to have received, at a minimum, a bachelor's degree; revising the information the Department of Education requires in a specified database relating to private schools; requiring private schools to provide specified students with a certain amount of time for recess; requiring private school students to participate in the statewide assessment program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-10-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H859 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1013385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback