FL S0638 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that this act may be referred to as "The Apalachicola Environmental Stewardship Act"; appropriating a sum annually for a specified timeframe from the Florida Forever Fund to the Apalachicola Area of Critical State Concern for specified purposes; renaming the Apalachicola Bay Area of Critical State Concern as the Apalachicola Area of Critical State Concern; providing additional principles for guiding development within the Apalachicola Area of Critical State Concern to include projects that protect and improve water quality, etc.
Title
Apalachicola Environmental Stewardship Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1347 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
259 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |