FL S0640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain projects identified in a specified Indian River Lagoon Comprehensive Conservation and Management Plan are eligible for state funding consideration; directing the Department of Environmental Protection to coordinate with the South Florida Water Management District and the St. Johns River Water Management District to identify projects and grant recipients and to submit an annual report to the Governor, the Legislature, and specified persons, etc.
Title
Indian River Lagoon State Matching Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H153 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/640 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/640/BillText/Filed/HTML |