FL S0644 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 665 (Ch. 2013-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 665 (Ch. 2013-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing, rather than requiring, the Office of Financial Regulation to deny a mortgage broker license application if the applicant had a mortgage broker license revoked previously; revising the procedures and requirements for submitting fingerprints as part of an application to sell, or offer to sell, securities; requiring the Office of Financial Regulation to pay an annual fee to the Department of Law Enforcement; revising license application fees to include fingerprint retention fees as prescribed by rule, etc.
Title
Licensure by the Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 665 (Ch. 2013-201) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 665 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/11/13, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/08/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0665 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-201
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
494 | 00321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |